Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix-Antoine-Philibert Dupanloup

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1802Born
17 Dec 182523.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 184947.2SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
28 Sep 184947.7ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
9 Dec 184947.9Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
11 Dec 184947.9InstalledBishop of Orléans, France
11 Oct 187876.7DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Félix-Antoine-Philibert Dupanloup (VIAF: 27102015)
Bishop Félix-Antoine-Philibert Dupanloup (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Félix
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017