Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Brillac

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Nov 1473AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
22 Dec 1504AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
17 Jan 1506DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for François de Brillac
Archbishop François de Brillac (died ) Archbishop of Aix

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,473, Number 42*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast