Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Louis Fort

Bishop Emeritus of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1935 BornChalon-sur-Saône
8 Apr 196226.6Ordained PriestPriest of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
18 Feb 199559.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
9 Jul 199559.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
16 Jan 199660.3SucceededBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
28 Nov 200267.2AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
5 Jan 200367.3InstalledBishop of Orléans, France
27 Jul 201074.9RetiredBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for André Louis Fort:
Bishop André Louis Fort (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Orléans

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orléans.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,572

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Mar 2014