Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Paul Marie Maupu

Bishop Emeritus of Verdun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1939 Born
29 Jun 196424.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Orléans, France
20 Dec 196425.3Ordained PriestPriest of Orléans, France
9 Mar 200060.5AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
30 Apr 200060.6Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
3 Jul 201474.8RetiredBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for François Paul Marie Maupu (VIAF: 219459722)
Bishop François Paul Marie Maupu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeuville-aux-Bois, Diocese of Orléans
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Verdun, Diocese of Verdun

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Verdun.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,752
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2014
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 9 Jul 2018

Quantcast