Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christophe de Brillac

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 May 1500AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
15 May 1503AppointedArchbishop of Aix, France
22 Sep 1503AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
19 Jan 1504AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orléans, France
22 Dec 1504AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orléans, France
4 Feb 1514AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
3 Jul 1514AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
31 Jul 1520DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Christophe de Brillac
Archbishop Christophe de Brillac (died ) Archbishop of Tours

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourges

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112, and Page 124
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 321, and Page 316
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 17*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast