Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marin Rouph de Varicourt

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1755BornGex
19 Dec 177823.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 181762.2SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
23 Aug 181964.3ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
12 Dec 181964.6Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
5 Jan 182064.7InstalledBishop of Orléans, France
9 Dec 182267.6DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marin Rouph de Varicourt:
Bishop Pierre-Marin Rouph de Varicourt (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013