Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Brumault de Beauregard

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orléans, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1749Born
23 Jan 182373.2SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
10 Mar 182373.3ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
1 May 182373.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
22 Jan 183989.2RetiredBishop of Orléans, France
26 Nov 184192.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Brumault de Beauregard
Bishop Jean Brumault de Beauregard (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoitiers

  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 96
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,823, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast