Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Henri-Célestin Gibier

Deceased

Bishop of Versailles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1849BornArtenay
7 Jun 187323.5Ordained PriestPriest of Orléans, France
21 Feb 190656.2AppointedBishop of Versailles, France
25 Feb 190656.2Ordained BishopBishop of Versailles, France
3 Apr 193181.3DiedBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Henri-Célestin Gibier:
Bishop Charles-Henri-Célestin Gibier (born , died ) Bishop of Versailles

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013