Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Marc Eychenne

Bishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1956 BornPamiers
4 Jul 198124.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Genova, Italy
3 Jul 198225.6Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
2 Dec 199438.0IncardinatedPriest of Orléans, France
17 Dec 201458.1AppointedBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France
15 Feb 201558.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marc Eychenne:
Bishop Jean-Marc Eychenne (born ) Bishop of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix)

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pamiers (-Couserans-Mirepoix).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Dec 2014
  • inca: CB, 17 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 20 Dec 2014
  • od/op/c1: CB, 22 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jan 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015