Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Le Normand

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1662¹BornOrléans
10 Nov 171048.8AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
21 Dec 171048.9Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
7 May 173371.3DiedBishop of Evreux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Le Normand:
Bishop Jean Le Normand (born 1662, died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 191
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015