Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustave Vié

Deceased

Bishop of Monaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1849BornEscrennes, France
21 Dec 187223.5Ordained PriestPriest of Orléans, France
8 May 191666.9AppointedBishop of Monaco
25 Jul 191667.1Ordained BishopBishop of Monaco
10 Jul 191869.1DiedBishop of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Gustave Vié:
Bishop Gustave Vié (born , died ) Bishop of Monaco

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013