Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles de Fontaine des Montees

Deceased

Bishop of Nevers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1669¹Born
18 Aug 171950.6SelectedBishop of Nevers, France
18 Sep 171950.7ConfirmedBishop of Nevers, France
12 Nov 171950.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nevers, France
30 Jan 172051.0InstalledBishop of Nevers, France
20 Feb 174071.1DiedBishop of Nevers, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles de Fontaine des Montees
Bishop Charles de Fontaine des Montees (born 1669, died ) Bishop of Nevers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrléans, Diocese of Orléans

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,719, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast