Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre du Chastel

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1539AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
2 Apr 1544AppointedBishop of Mâcon, France
12 Oct 1551AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
3 Feb 1552DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre du Chastel (VIAF: 46920623)
Bishop Pierre du Chastel (died ) Bishop of Orléans

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 322, and Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1539, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast