Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse d’Elbène

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornSens
21 Jan 164747.0AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
27 May 164747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
20 May 166565.3DiedBishop of Orléans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse d’Elbène:
Bishop Alphonse d’Elbène (died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 102
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015