Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Alexandre-Jean-Baptiste-Marie Bernier

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1762BornDaon-sur-Mayenne
178623.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 180239.4SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
10 Apr 180239.4ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
11 Apr 180239.4Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
1 Oct 180643.9DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Alexandre-Jean-Baptiste-Marie Bernier:
Bishop Etienne-Alexandre-Jean-Baptiste-Marie Bernier (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013