Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri-Louis Chapon

Deceased

Bishop of Nice, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1845Born
22 May 186924.1Ordained PriestPriest of Orléans, France
30 May 189651.2SelectedBishop of Nice, France
25 Jun 189651.2ConfirmedBishop of Nice, France
29 Sep 189651.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
14 Dec 192580.7DiedBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for Henri-Louis Chapon (VIAF: 46842450)
Bishop Henri-Louis Chapon (born , died ) Bishop of Nice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Brieuc, Diocese of Saint-Brieuc
Ordained BishopSte Croix, Cathedral, Orléans, Diocese of Orléans
Death PlaceNice, Diocese of Nice

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c1+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 412
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017