Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Marie-Victor Courcoux, C.Or.Iesu †

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans, France

Note/Previous Titular See: (Oratorio di Gesu & Maria Immac. di Parigi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1870Born
4 Jun 189625.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 192656.4AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
18 Jan 192756.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
25 Jan 192756.5InstalledBishop of Orléans, France
28 Mar 195180.7DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Marie-Victor Courcoux
Bishop Jules-Marie-Victor Courcoux C.Or.Iesu (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLannion

  • a priest for 54.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast