Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Auguste-Léopold Laroche

Deceased

Bishop of Nantes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1845Born
19 Dec 186823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Orléans, France
3 Jan 189347.4SelectedBishop of Nantes, France
19 Jan 189347.4ConfirmedBishop of Nantes, France
4 Apr 189347.6Ordained BishopBishop of Nantes, France
18 Dec 189550.3DiedBishop of Nantes, France

MicroData Summary for Auguste-Léopold Laroche (VIAF: 100977899)
Bishop Auguste-Léopold Laroche (born , died ) Bishop of Nantes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Ferté-Saint-Aubin
Ordained BishopCathedral, Orléans, Diocese of Orléans

  • a priest for 26.9 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 402
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 May 2017