Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antoine Cardinal Sanguin de Meudon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orléans, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1493Born
6 Nov 153340.8AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
19 Dec 153946.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jul 154148.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
13 Aug 154451.6AppointedBishop of Limoges, France
26 Oct 154754.8ResignedBishop of Limoges, France
28 Feb 155057.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
20 Oct 155057.8ResignedBishop of Orléans, France
25 Nov 155966.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Sanguin de Meudon
Antoine Cardinal Sanguin de Meudon (born 1493, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orléans

EventPlace
Birth Place

  • a cardinal for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 124, and Page 222

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast