Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Andrich

Bishop Emeritus of Belluno-Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1940 BornCanale d'Agordo
28 Jun 196525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
29 May 200464.1AppointedBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
27 Jun 200464.2Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
10 Feb 201675.8RetiredBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Andrich
Bishop Giuseppe Andrich (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Belluno-Feltre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belluno-Feltre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,614
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 10 Apr 2016