Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nel Hedye Beltrán Santamaria

Bishop Emeritus of Sincelejo, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1941 Born
29 Jun 196422.5Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 199250.3AppointedBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia
6 Jun 199250.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia
15 Mar 201472.2ResignedBishop of Sincelejo, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Nel Hedye Beltrán Santamaria
Bishop Nel Hedye Beltrán Santamaria (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Sincelejo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Andrés

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sincelejo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,779
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast