Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Orlando Antonio Corrales García

Archbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1947 BornAbejorral
5 Dec 197124.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 199851.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
28 Jan 199851.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
25 Mar 199851.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
9 Apr 200154.2AppointedBishop of Palmira, Colombia
12 Jan 200759.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia, Colombia
Apr 2014²67.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sincelejo, Colombia
28 Mar 201568.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Sincelejo, Colombia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Orlando Antonio Corrales García:
Archbishop Orlando Antonio Corrales García (born ) Archbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Fe de Antioquia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,257
  • ab: CB, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 21 Feb 2015