Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Mogavero

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1947 Born
12 Jul 197023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
22 Feb 200759.8AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
24 Mar 200759.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
1 Apr 200760.0InstalledBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Mogavero
Bishop Domenico Mogavero (born ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelbuono

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mazara del Vallo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2007
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast