Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guido Fiandino

Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}

Titular Bishop of Aleria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1941 BornSavigliano
28 Jun 196423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Jun 200261.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
21 Jun 200261.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Aleria
20 Jul 200261.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aleria

MicroData Summary for Guido Fiandino:
Bishop Guido Fiandino (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Torino {Turin}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,230

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013