Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Urso

Bishop Emeritus of Ragusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1940 BornAcireale
7 Oct 196222.4Ordained PriestPriest of Acireale, Italy
16 Feb 200261.8AppointedBishop of Ragusa, Italy
12 Apr 200261.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ragusa, Italy
7 Oct 201575.4RetiredBishop of Ragusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Urso:
Bishop Paolo Urso (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ragusa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ragusa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,173
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015