Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Loppa

Bishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1947 Born
17 Jul 197124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Segni, Italy
28 Jun 200254.9AppointedBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy
22 Sep 200255.1Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni-Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Loppa (VIAF: 88611014)
Bishop Lorenzo Loppa (born ) Bishop of Anagni-Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegni, Diocese of Segni
Ordained BishopCathedral, Anagni, Diocese of Anagni-Alatri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Anagni-Alatri.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast