Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso Llano Ruiz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1931Born
6 Jan 197341.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 199361.8AppointedBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
29 May 199361.9Ordained BishopBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
5 Jun 201078.9RetiredBishop of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia
26 Mar 201583.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Istmina-Tadó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Alonso Llano Ruiz
Bishop Alonso Llano Ruiz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Istmina-Tadó

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarulanda

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,112
  • d: CB, 26 Mar 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast