Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giancarlo Vecerrica

Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1940 Born
22 May 196524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
30 Dec 200262.4AppointedBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy
22 Feb 200362.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy
18 Mar 201675.6RetiredBishop of Fabriano-Matelica, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giancarlo Vecerrica
Bishop Giancarlo Vecerrica (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Fabriano-Matelica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTolentino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fabriano-Matelica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,336
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast