Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Carmine Orofino

Bishop of Tursi-Lagonegro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1953 BornSan Severino Lucano
4 Oct 198027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
20 Mar 200450.6AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
15 May 200450.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tricarico, Italy
28 Apr 201662.8AppointedBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy
25 Jun 201662.9InstalledBishop of Tursi-Lagonegro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Carmine Orofino
Bishop Vincenzo Carmine Orofino (born ) Bishop of Tursi-Lagonegro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tursi-Lagonegro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,593
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 2 Sep 2016