Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio César Vidal Ortiz

Bishop of Cúcuta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1944 BornTierralta
7 Apr 197328.8Ordained PriestPriest of Alto Sinú, Colombia
16 Dec 199349.5AppointedPrelate of Alto Sinú, Colombia
18 Feb 199449.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Alto Sinú, Colombia
29 Dec 199854.5AppointedBishop of Montelibano, Colombia
31 Oct 200157.4AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
16 Jul 201167.1AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
10 Sep 201167.2InstalledBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Julio César Vidal Ortiz:
Bishop Julio César Vidal Ortiz (born ) Bishop of Cúcuta

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cúcuta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2011
  • i: CB, 16 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,420

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013