Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Iván Antonio Marín López

Archbishop Emeritus of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1938 Born
8 Dec 196426.5Ordained PriestPriest
199253.6AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council “Cor Unum”
19 Apr 199758.9AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
6 Jun 199759.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
1 Dec 201476.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
15 Dec 201577.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Mocoa-Sibundoy, Colombia
19 May 201880.0RetiredArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Iván Antonio Marín López
Archbishop Iván Antonio Marín López (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJardin
Ordained BishopColiseo Cubierto La Estancia, Popayán, Archdiocese of Popayán

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Popayán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,010
  • ab: CB, 1 Dec 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 19 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 May 2018

Quantcast