Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Negri

Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1941 Born
28 Jun 197230.5Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
17 Mar 200563.3AppointedBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
7 May 200563.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
22 May 200563.4InstalledBishop of San Marino-Montefeltro, Italy
1 Dec 201271.0AppointedArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy
15 Feb 201775.2RetiredArchbishop of Ferrara-Comacchio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Negri (VIAF: 27117978)
Archbishop Luigi Negri (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara-Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Ferrara-Comacchio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,883
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017