Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Scanavino, O.S.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto-Todi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1939 BornSanto Stefano Belbo
7 Oct 195616.8ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
14 Mar 196424.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
8 Nov 200363.9AppointedBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
27 Dec 200364.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy
5 Mar 201171.2ResignedBishop of Orvieto-Todi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Scanavino:
Bishop Giovanni Scanavino O.S.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto-Todi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orvieto-Todi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,493

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013