Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo de Jesús Rivera Gómez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Bennefa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1933Born
16 Oct 196026.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 199864.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
28 Jan 199864.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bennefa
25 Mar 199864.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bennefa
16 Feb 201076.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Medellín, Colombia
20 Oct 201985.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Medellín, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo de Jesús Rivera Gómez
Bishop Gonzalo de Jesús Rivera Gómez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Medellín

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarinilla
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Medellín, Archdiocese of Medellín
Death PlaceClinica Sommer, Rionegro

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,256
  • d: CB, 20 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 22 Oct 2019

Quantcast