Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Angelo Scotti

Bishop Emeritus of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1942 Born
25 Jun 196725.3Ordained PriestPriest of Chieti, Italy
17 Oct 200563.6AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
8 Dec 200563.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
18 Dec 200563.8InstalledBishop of Trivento, Italy
5 Jun 201775.3RetiredBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Angelo Scotti
Bishop Domenico Angelo Scotti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlacePollutri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trivento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 15,015
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Sep 2017