Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Enrique Lozano Zafra

Bishop Emeritus of Ocaña, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1938 Born
19 Dec 196426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bucaramanga, Colombia
28 Jun 199355.2AppointedBishop of Ocaña, Colombia
6 Aug 199355.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ocaña, Colombia
15 May 201476.0RetiredBishop of Ocaña, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Enrique Lozano Zafra
Bishop Jorge Enrique Lozano Zafra (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ocaña

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ocaña.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,123
  • r: Bollettino, 15 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast