Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Quintero Díaz

Vicar Apostolic of Leticia

Titular Bishop of Chimaera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1949 BornCopacabana
26 Jul 197525.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 199646.4AppointedPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
2 Mar 199646.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Tibú, Colombia
29 Dec 199849.4AppointedBishop of Tibú, Colombia
23 Oct 200051.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Leticia, Colombia
23 Oct 200051.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Chimaera

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Quintero Díaz:
Bishop José de Jesús Quintero Díaz (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Leticia

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Leticia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,691

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013