Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Southwark

Archidioecesis Southvarcensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter David Gregory Smith, Archbishop
  • Paul Hendricks, Auxiliary Bishop
  • John Franklin Meldon Hine, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Patrick Kevin Lynch, SS.CC., Auxiliary Bishop
  • Michael George Bowen, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Kevin John Patrick McDonald, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Howard George Tripp, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 May 1965
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: England
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 3,000 (1,158 Square Miles)
  • Description: The London Boroughs South of the Thames, the county of Kent and the Medway Unitary Authority.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcsouthwark.co.uk/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 150 St. George's Road, Southwark, London SE1 6HX, England, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (020)7928-5592
  • Fax: 7401-7383

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Southwark
29 September 1850ErectedVicariate Apostolic of London District Diocese of Southwark (erected)
19 May 1882Territory LostDiocese of Southwark Diocese of Portsmouth (erected)
28 May 1965Territory LostDiocese of Southwark Diocese of Arundel and Brighton (erected)
Archdiocese of Southwark
28 May 1965ElevatedDiocese of Southwark Archdiocese of Southwark

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Southwark
1950200,0005,000,0004.0%471306777257204ap1951
Archdiocese of Southwark
1970353,5024,320,0008.2%3601965566352681,566170ap1971
1980395,1584,241,0009.3%31219050278712871,190173ap1981
1990385,4864,040,0009.5%31618650276737272989186ap1991
1999380,9794,048,9009.4%31513444984864171869186ap2000
2000383,7334,048,9009.5%31912344286866146816185ap2001
2001387,6954,048,8909.6%28311940296470172656184ap2002
2002377,7264,048,9009.3%27812340194171182740183ap2003
2003376,4014,048,9009.3%29911841790277176753185ap2004
2004385,384404,89095.2%27312039398078160705185ap2005
2010383,265444,06586.3%27414441891680195589181ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.2, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014