Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Franklin Meldon Hine

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark, England

Titular Bishop of Beverlacum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1938 BornTunbridge Wells
28 Oct 196224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 200162.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
26 Jan 200162.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Beverlacum
27 Feb 200162.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Beverlacum
7 May 201677.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Franklin Meldon Hine
Bishop John Franklin Meldon Hine (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Southwark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,922
  • mn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • r: CL, 4 May 2016
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 May 2016