Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Peter Jukes, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Strathernia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1923Born
19 Jul 195228.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Dec 197956.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 197956.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Strathernia
30 Jan 198056.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Strathernia
11 Dec 199875.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 201188.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Peter Jukes
Bishop John Peter Jukes O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEltham, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt Anthony of Padua, Friary, Mossley Hill, Liverpool, Lancashire, Archdiocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Death PlaceWillowbank, Huntly, Aberdeenshire, Diocese of Aberdeen, Scotland
Buried Place (Original)St. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 26 Mar 2018