Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edmund Luck, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1848Born
186516.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Jul 188234.3AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
13 Aug 188234.4Ordained BishopBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
23 Jan 189647.8DiedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for John Edmund Luck
Bishop John Edmund Luck O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Auckland

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeckham, Diocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopRamsgate, Diocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 130
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1882, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018