Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arthur Henry Doubleday

Deceased

Bishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1865Born
22 Dec 188823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
7 May 192054.5AppointedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
23 Jun 192054.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
23 Jan 195185.2DiedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Arthur Henry Doubleday (VIAF: 261038945)
Bishop Arthur Henry Doubleday (born , died ) Bishop of Brentwood

EventPlace
Birth PlacePietermaritzburg, Natal, Vicariate Apostolic of Natal, South Africa
Ordained PriestSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Death PlaceBishop's House, Queens Road, Brentwood, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England
Buried Place (Original)Churchyard, Sacred Heart and St. Helen, Cathedral, Brentwood, Essex, Diocese of Brentwood, England

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 92
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 81
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast