Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Every Konstant

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Leeds, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1930Born
12 Jun 195423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Westminster, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 197746.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 197746.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Betagbarar
25 Apr 197746.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Betagbarar
12 Jul 198555.0AppointedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
25 Sep 198555.2InstalledBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
7 Apr 200473.8ResignedBishop of Leeds, England, Great Britain
9 Oct 201686.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Leeds, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for David Every Konstant (VIAF: 6562037)
Bishop David Every Konstant (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Leeds

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBlackheath, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceLittle Sisters of the Poor, Convent, Headingley, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Anne, Cathedral, Leeds, West Yorkshire, Diocese of Leeds, England

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 Oct 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast