Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Malcolm Patrick McMahon, O.P.

Archbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1949 Born
1977²27.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
26 Jun 198233.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
7 Nov 200051.3AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
8 Dec 200051.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
21 Mar 201464.7AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
1 May 201464.8InstalledArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Malcolm Patrick McMahon
Archbishop Malcolm Patrick McMahon O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Liverpool

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrixton, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestOur Lady and St. Dominic, Church, Haverstock Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSaint Barnabas, Cathedral, Nottingham, Nottinghamshire, Diocese of Nottingham, England

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Liverpool.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,866
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 21 Mar 2014
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 5 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast