Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cyril Conrad Cowderoy

Deceased

Archbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1905Born
30 May 193126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
12 Dec 194944.6AppointedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
21 Dec 194944.6Ordained BishopBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
28 May 196560.0AppointedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
10 Oct 197671.4DiedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Cyril Conrad Cowderoy (VIAF: 88704282)
Archbishop Cyril Conrad Cowderoy (born , died ) Archbishop of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSidcup, Kent, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopMost Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death PlaceSt. Thomas More, Church, West Malling, Kent, Archdiocese of Southwark, England
Buried Place (Original)St. George, Cathedral, Southwark, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 45.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 110
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 73
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast