Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael George Bowen

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1930Born
6 Jul 195828.2Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
28 May 196535.0IncardinatedPriest of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
18 May 197040.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
18 May 197040.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
27 Jun 197040.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamsorti
14 Mar 197140.8SucceededBishop of Arundel and Brighton, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 197746.9AppointedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
6 Nov 200373.5ResignedArchbishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
17 Oct 201989.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Michael George Bowen
Archbishop Michael George Bowen (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGibraltar, Diocese of Gibraltar
Ordained PriestSCJ Motherhouse, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopOur Lady and St. Philip Neri, Cathedral, Arundel, West Sussex, Diocese of Arundel and Brighton, England
Death PlaceSt. Peter’s Home, Vauxhall, Archdiocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • c1/op.loc: CL, 23 Apr 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 548
  • d: CB, 17 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 18 Oct 2019

Quantcast