Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Andrew Beck, A.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Liverpool, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1904BornStreatham
24 Jul 192723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
7 Aug 194844.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
7 Aug 194844.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigias
21 Sep 194844.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigias
23 Jan 195146.6SucceededBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
28 Nov 195551.5AppointedBishop of Salford, England, Great Britain
29 Jan 196459.6AppointedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
7 Feb 197671.6ResignedArchbishop of Liverpool, England, Great Britain
13 Sep 197874.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Liverpool, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for George Andrew Beck:
Archbishop George Andrew Beck A.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Liverpool

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 98
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015