Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Aston Coffin, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1819Born
3 Dec 184526.3Converted
31 Oct 184728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
2 Feb 185232.5ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
23 May 188262.8AppointedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
11 Jun 188262.8Ordained BishopBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
27 Jul 188263.0InstalledBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
6 Apr 188565.7DiedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Aston Coffin (VIAF: 62823277)
Bishop Robert Aston Coffin C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrighton Sussex
Ordained BishopSant'Alfonso de Liguori, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 37.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 525
  • op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1882, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017