Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Danell

Deceased

Bishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1821Born
6 Jun 184826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
10 Jan 187149.4AppointedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
25 Mar 187149.6Ordained BishopBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain
14 Jun 188159.9DiedBishop of Southwark, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for James Danell
Bishop James Danell (born , died ) Bishop of Southwark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Ordained BishopSt. George's, Cathedral, Southwark, Diocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 525
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017