Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Patrick Wall

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brentwood, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Othona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1894Born
14 Jul 191824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Southwark, England, Great Britain
30 Nov 195561.7AppointedBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
18 Jan 195661.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
14 Apr 196975.0RetiredBishop of Brentwood, England, Great Britain
14 Apr 196975.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Othona
18 Jun 197682.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Brentwood, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Patrick Wall
Bishop Bernard Patrick Wall (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brentwood

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTonbridge, Kent, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained PriestSt. John, Seminary, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Diocese of Southwark, England
Ordained BishopImmaculate Heart of Mary, Brompton Oratory, Kensington, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England
Death Place18 Bressey Grove, South Woodford, London, Diocese of Brentwood, England
Buried Place (Original)St. John, Seminary, Wonersh, Guildford, Surrey, Archdiocese of Southwark, England

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 6
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 205
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • loc: CL, 27 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 31 Mar 2018